SMILES ACROSS NEPAL

Charity number: 1150579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 11 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required