SMILES ACROSS NEPAL

Charity number: 1150579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £7.14k £5.24k £33.31k £4.75k £23.60k
Total expenditure £5.75k £4.92k £26.20k £5.18k £4.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A