BLUE APPLE THEATRE

Charity number: 1151078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download