BLUE APPLE THEATRE

Charity number: 1151078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £218.46k £151.00k £148.73k £204.67k £150.04k
Total expenditure £198.88k £131.88k £151.50k £178.68k £204.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.34k £8.50k £8.95k £14.43k £20.93k