BLUE APPLE THEATRE

Charity number: 1151078
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kim Alexander Gottlieb Trustee 05 June 2018 None on record
Rebecca Sheppard Trustee 01 December 2015 None on record
GEORGIANA ROBERTSON Trustee 31 December 2012 None on record
Marilyn Stevens Weston Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
Jonathan David Brown Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
Professor Edward James Rochead Trustee 17 April 2018
THE INSTITUTE OF MATHEMATICS AND ITS APPLICATIONS Received: On time
Duncan Stuart Rutter Trustee 12 July 2017 None on record
ROSS HARVIE Trustee 12 July 2017 None on record
Cara Lindsey Honey Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Lucy Anne McKenna Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record