Financial history THE ROUGHAM ESTATE TRUST

Charity number: 1155315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £198.69k £248.11k £236.61k £248.65k £245.13k
Total expenditure £163.12k £91.80k £88.29k £84.66k £76.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A