293RD BIRMINGHAM (ST FAITH AND ST LAURENCE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.93k £9.87k £7.90k £15.97k £44.90k
Total expenditure £9.82k £6.12k £9.64k £21.92k £19.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A