Financial history DANIA SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1153166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £249.81k £346.51k £399.11k £371.64k £376.82k
Total expenditure £297.55k £334.55k £330.69k £376.21k £408.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A