THE HMS CAROLINE PRESERVATION COMPANY

Charity Number: 1149930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects are to educate the Naval Service and auxiliaries and other members of the public about the history of HMS Caroline and the history of the Royal Navy and other matters relating to the defence of the realm.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £301,798
Total expenditure: £936,922

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Portsmouth City
  • Northern Ireland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Scott Armstrong Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Richard Noel Brady Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
JOHN MICHAEL ELSWORTH SCOTT Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
John McMillen Trustee 21 August 2015
None on record
John Richard Armstrong Trustee 21 August 2015
None on record
Captain Martin Edward Quinn Trustee 21 August 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £16 £2.08k £1.69k £301.80k
Total expenditure £119 £118 £1.96k £554.61k £936.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 22 NOV 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO PRESERVE, RESTORE AND MAINTAIN THE SHIP; (B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE HISTORY OF THE SHIP AND THE HISTORY OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM; (C) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES BY ASSISTING RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION AND FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS OF THE MEN AND WOMEN WHO ARE SERVING IN THE NAVAL SERVICE OR AUXILIARIES; (D) TO COMMEMORATE AND REMEMBER THOSE MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL SERVICE AND AUXILIARIES WHO HAVE DIED WHILE ON ACTIVE SERVICE: AND TO ENCOURAGE PUBLIC RECOGNITION OF THE SACRIFICE MADE BY SUCH PERSONS, THE "SHIP" IS DEFINED AS "HMS CAROLINE THE LIGHT CRUISER WHICH WAS COMMISSIONED BY THE ROYAL NAVY FROM 1914 UNTIL 2011".
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 03 December 2012 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
NMRN PP66
HM Naval Base
Portsmouth
Hants
PO13NH
Phone:
02392727572
Website:

No information available