Financial history FRIENDS OF ST SWITHUN'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1150288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £12.12k £8.07k £6.80k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.58k £10.56k £7.80k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A