Accounts and annual returns OXFORD PRIDE GROUP LTD

Charity number: 1151400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 June 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 July 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 15 July 2020 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 July 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 13 July 2019 43 days late Download Open in new window