Financial history OXFORD PRIDE GROUP LTD

Charity number: 1151400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £25.90k £33.51k £4.50k £14.63k £38.22k
Total expenditure £19.28k £21.91k £4.41k £19.48k £30.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.59k £1.10k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.50k