Financial history LANDPORT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1150865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.86k £4.91k £3.38k £3.51k £5.60k
Total expenditure £11.19k £3.93k £4.75k £4.23k £3.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A