THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CHAD CHADWELL HEATH

Charity number: 1150077
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 28 September 2016 On time Download