Accounts and annual returns DICKENS GIFT TO YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1151401
Charity reporting is overdue by 227 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 February 2021 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required