Financial history DICKENS GIFT TO YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1151401
Charity reporting is overdue by 235 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.50k £4.33k £1.01k £5 £0
Total expenditure £3.36k £2.30k £0 £431 £720
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A