Financial history THE FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1151922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.76k £4.08k £3.93k £1.86k £1.92k
Total expenditure £3.29k £0 £4.83k £811 £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A