Trustees THE FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1151922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip William Harcus Chair 24 October 2019
None on record
Allison Merry Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
RICHARD AKISTER Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
CYNTHIA BARNES Trustee 05 September 2017
None on record
BARBARA WADE Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
IAN ELDRIDGE Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record