Accounts and annual returns BRITISH EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1150237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window