Trustees BRITISH EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1150237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Vivienne Baumfield | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gurpinder Lalli | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Diana Burton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mabel Encinas | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sin Wang Chong | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sally Power | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Yuwei Xu | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barbara Skinner | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Seleznyov | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tanya Ovenden-Hope | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Fox | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Morag Redford | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marlon Moncrieffe | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ros McLellan | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Bruce Dominic Wyse | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mhairi Beaton | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerry Czerniawski | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.