Financial history DEEPER CHRISTIAN LIFE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1150036
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.55m £3.28m £3.29m £3.04m £3.47m
Total expenditure £2.58m £2.65m £2.51m £1.76m £2.16m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.99m £2.71m £2.93m £2.84m £3.24m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £332.82k £334.20k £188.74k £0 £29.82k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £145.14k £141.02k £155.38k £92.01k £115.71k
Income - Other £82.07k £90.14k £15.46k £113.37k £90.80k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.58m £2.65m £2.51m £1.76m £2.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0