GASTROENTEROLOGY TRAINING ACADEMY

Charity number: 1150282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2018 22 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Not Required