Financial history GASTROENTEROLOGY TRAINING ACADEMY

Charity number: 1150282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2018 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022
Total gross income £11.88k £2.91k £8.46k £3.05k £2.28k
Total expenditure £7.92k £8.32k £7.80k £4.10k £5
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A