BEAMINSTER YARN BARTON COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1150899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.45k £18.63k £16.68k £20.49k £12.33k
Total expenditure £9.13k £8.66k £13.07k £14.21k £12.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.51k £0 £2.55k £8.20k £2.00k