Financial history DESTINY CHRISTIAN CENTRE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1152510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £329.59k £236.23k £229.29k £139.06k £103.63k
Total expenditure £297.14k £220.84k £218.62k £153.60k £101.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £58.86k N/A N/A £13.83k