Financial history ST GERMANS PRIORY

Charity number: 1151027
Charity reporting is overdue by 262 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £11.57k £8.32k £15.06k £15.37k £46.53k
Total expenditure £12.02k £12.11k £10.36k £7.73k £41.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A £2.84k N/A £25.00k