Financial history OAKS MARTIAL ARTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £118.05k £138.12k £136.47k £137.01k £72.04k
Total expenditure £117.62k £121.71k £139.16k £141.76k £69.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A