Financial history RELATIONAL MISSION

Charity number: 1150583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £480.79k £642.60k £487.42k £643.70k £489.15k
Total expenditure £463.35k £670.86k £567.92k £528.58k £508.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £4.80k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £507.80k N/A £583.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £134.79k N/A £59.80k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £670.86k N/A £528.58k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.24k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £104.74k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A