SISTERS OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY TRUST

Charity number: 1150264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download