SOUTH HEADINGLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503373
Charity reporting is overdue by 1065 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 333 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Overdue Overdue by 700 days
Annual return 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1065 days
Annual return 28 February 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 12 September 2017 258 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required