SOUTH HEADINGLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503373
Charity reporting is overdue by 1067 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017
Total gross income £632 £2.78k £4.32k £6.50k £5.50k
Total expenditure £851 £2.69k £4.01k £5.00k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A