UNITY CHURCH, ORPINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly services of Public Worship. Community Family Events. Twice weekly Community Foodshare followed by Community Cafe. Support for Street Pastors, Job Club and Life Skills Courses. Youth Club & Youth Mentoring. Community Garden. Get Active Gym and Dance Activities. Mid Week Bible Study Groups. Quarterly Men's and Women's Events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 22 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL MALTMAN BA, PGCE | Chair | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Katerina Dadier | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amy Catharine Kolver | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Massimo Massaro | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Price | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.05k | £73.67k | £90.90k | £85.53k | £124.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.34k | £75.99k | £81.84k | £85.85k | £103.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ORPINGTON, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unity Church
Rye Crescent
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR5 4NH
- Phone:
- 07723 291151
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window