Financial history ST OSWALD'S HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 503386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.58m £12.67m £14.69m £13.45m £13.94m
Total expenditure £12.48m £13.11m £13.74m £12.72m £13.08m
Income from government contracts £3.84m £4.06m £4.31m £4.28m £5.00m
Income from government grants £199.82k N/A £687.99k £2.11m £664.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.92m £3.22m £4.21m £3.78m £3.44m
Income - Other trading activities £5.57m £5.34m £5.88m £2.74m £4.75m
Income - Charitable activities £4.04m £4.06m £4.55m £6.13m £5.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.27k £44.66k £46.92k £55.34k £45.05k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £730.91k £60.77k
Income - Legacies £1.41m £1.52m £2.22m £1.80m £1.95m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.21m £8.74m £9.02m £8.81m £8.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.26m £4.36m £4.71m £3.92m £4.25m
Expenditure - Governance £422.24k £439.34k £491.82k £283.56k £259.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.67k £4.86k £60.80k £8.84k £17.10k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0