Trustees ST OSWALD'S HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 503386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine English Chair 14 December 2015
None on record
David Iain Reynolds Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Richard Taylor Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Sue Sinton Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Dr Neil Morris Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
James Holmes Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Imogen Holland Trustee 03 February 2021
None on record
Laura Lloyd Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Graeme Boulton Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Stephen James Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
Nick Hobdey Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Tricia Phillips Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
David Hicks Trustee 25 September 2018
None on record