THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MARKET BOSWORTH, CADEBY WITH SUTTON CHENEY AND CONGERSTONE

Charity number: 1150873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £295.97k £281.55k £289.01k £588.06k £232.49k
Total expenditure £572.89k £330.26k £199.47k £544.71k £266.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.85k £0 N/A £49.90k £17.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £387.39k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £9.77k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £49.60k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £141.31k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £2.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £539.94k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £4.77k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £10.64k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £4.40k N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A