MID NORFOLK FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 06 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 23 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 June 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 June 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Annual return 28 June 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 June 2017 01 November 2017 On time