MID NORFOLK FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/06/2017 28/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £6.21k £5.72k £6.16k £25.02k £44.25k
Total expenditure £4.15k £4.54k £7.64k £9.67k £25.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A