Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE-IN-THE-CITY, LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1152031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £115.45k £109.19k £501.10k £142.47k £141.69k
Total expenditure £268.96k £134.95k £133.25k £118.42k £148.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.70k N/A £6.15k £3.58k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £53.43k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £42.65k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £18.23k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £6.11k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £380.69k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £128.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £4.89k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.46k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £1.53k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A