Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE-IN-THE-CITY, LIVERPOOL
Charity number: 1152031

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Miranda Threlfall-Holmes | Chair | 10 August 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Mari-Ann Valkass | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Helen Elizabeth Stocker | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sue Say | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Laura Sophia Ferguson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Emma Watson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lilly Rose Nelson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
James Stewart Fleming | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Katherine Pace | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Louis James Johnson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rosemary Margaret Green | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sharon Ginley | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GWYNETH EVANS | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER JAMES BARTLEY | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
KAREN LESLEY PARSONS | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.