AHAVAS TORAH BOYS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1150729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £80.61k £122.06k £146.07k £193.95k £275.92k
Total expenditure £75.43k £117.62k £140.09k £190.11k £284.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A