Financial history CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST SIDCUP KENT PARISH

Charity number: 1151253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £19.64k £24.95k £24.32k £40.51k £89.94k
Total expenditure £31.00k £23.67k £27.34k £6.13k £62.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A