THE ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL GENOMIC SCIENCE

Charity number: 1153826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £47.43k £34.87k £42.81k £42.22k £47.59k
Total expenditure £39.19k £40.07k £55.20k £48.98k £63.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A