Accounts and annual returns ANTI-TRAFFICKING AND LABOUR EXPLOITATION UNIT (ATLEU) LIMITED

Charity number: 1151675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 19 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 17 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 03 October 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 03 October 2019 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 15 October 2018 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 15 October 2018 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 13 December 2017 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 13 December 2017 74 days late Download Open in new window