Financial history ANTI-TRAFFICKING AND LABOUR EXPLOITATION UNIT (ATLEU) LIMITED

Charity number: 1151675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £280.94k £425.53k £449.91k £462.03k £526.29k
Total expenditure £251.70k £569.59k £371.39k £361.10k £445.82k
Income from government contracts £117.41k £273.40k N/A £183.80k £116.43k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.97k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.44k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £492.82k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.06k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £444.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £827
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £28