NORTH FELLS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 503400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.52k £9.72k £6.90k £10.99k £12.05k
Total expenditure £11.74k £10.16k £10.66k £7.13k £9.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k