ALTON CHRISTIAN CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1151471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time Download