ALTON CHRISTIAN CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1151471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £29.32k £24.66k £43.96k £46.70k £53.21k
Total expenditure £24.49k £34.74k £26.51k £45.66k £60.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.62k