Financial history LYMM FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1154232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £46.02k £52.10k £46.98k £50.88k £4.02k
Total expenditure £43.47k £39.98k £47.54k £49.35k £6.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A