Accounts and annual returns WINDRUSH NURSES & BEYOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2018 21 November 2019 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2017 25 January 2019 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2016 Not Required