Financial history WINDRUSH NURSES & BEYOND FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2016 01/11/2017 01/11/2018 01/11/2019 01/11/2020
Total gross income £432 £500 £1.01k £2.50k £1.06k
Total expenditure £240 £498 £2.95k £2.50k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A